EP1803796 - A lubricating oil composition for automatic transmissions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | For all designated states Chevron Texaco Japan Ltd. Mitsui Asahi Building, 10th Floor 1-1, Kanda, Suda-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-0041 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, Bldg. T 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583-2324 / US | ||
For all designated states Chevron Texaco Japan Ltd. Mitsui Asahi Building, 10th Floor 1-1, Kanda, Suda-cho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 101-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shiga, Michio 507-9, Manda Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Shiroi, Tomotsugu 605-26, Hazu Markinohara-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Takayama, Himiko 2386, Omaezaki Omaezaki-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Buitrago, Juan A. 1199 Earnest Street Hercules, California 94547 / US | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/43] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256579.1 | 22.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | JP20050373039 | 26.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005373039 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803796 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803796 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803796 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C10M163/00 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
C10M129/72 (EP,US);
C10M133/16 (EP,US);
C10M137/02 (EP,US);
C10M163/00 (EP,US);
C10M2203/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/126 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/223 (EP,US);
C10M2219/046 (EP,US);
C10M2223/04 (EP,US);
C10M2223/049 (EP,US);
C10M2229/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/18] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eine Schmierölzusammensetzung für Automatikgetriebe | [2007/27] | English: | A lubricating oil composition for automatic transmissions | [2007/27] | French: | Composition huileuse lubrifiante pour transmissions automatiques | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 23.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP1535986 (CHEVRONTEXACO JAPAN LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9827187 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,2,5,8,9 * * table 1 * * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 7 * * page 13, line 8 - line 10 *; | [PA]EP1674557 (CHEVRON ORONITE CO [US]) [PA] 1-13 * column 13, line 21 - line 50 * * examples 2,3 *; | [A]WO9847989 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,8,9 * * page 13, line 20 - line 24 *; | [A]WO9714773 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * claims 1,5 * |