EP1726774 - EQUALIZED LOAD DISTRIBUTION SLIPS FOR SPIDER AND ELEVATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Weatherford/Lamb, Inc. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston, TX 77027 / US | [2012/16] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC. 515 Post Oak Boulevard, Suite 600 Houston, TX 77027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shahin, David 9007 Uppercove Cr. Houston, TX 77064 / US | 02 /
Heidecke, Karsten 8410 Brighton Lake Ln. Houston Texas 77095 / US | [2010/08] |
Former [2007/19] | 01 /
Shahin, David 9007 Uppercove Cr. Houston, TX 77064 / US | ||
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
Shahun, David 9007 Uppercove Cr. Houston, TX 77064 / US | Representative(s) | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 2nd Floor, Wytham Court 11 West Way Oxford OX2 0JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk LLP 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | Talbot-Ponsonby, Daniel Frederick Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06270046.3 | 11.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20050680204P | 12.05.2005 Original published format: US 680204 P | US20050689199P | 09.06.2005 Original published format: US 689199 P | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1726774 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1726774 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726774 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E21B19/07, E21B19/10 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
E21B19/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2007/35] |
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABFANGKEILE FÜR RÖHRENSTRANGELEVATOR UND ROHRKEILKLEMMEN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINER AUSGEGLICHENE VERTEILUNG DER LASTEN | [2006/48] | English: | EQUALIZED LOAD DISTRIBUTION SLIPS FOR SPIDER AND ELEVATOR | [2006/48] | French: | ELEMENTS GLISSANTS POUR UN ARAIGNÉE OU UN ELEVATEUR FOURNISSANT UNE RÉPARTITION ÉGALISÉE DES CHARGES | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 13.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10174610.5 / EP2256286 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2061772 (MCLAGAN GEORGE E) [X] 19,20 * column 1, lines 5,6; figures 1,4-7 * * column 2, lines 20-22 * * column 3, lines 7-9 * * column 4, lines 30-36 * * column 6, lines 20-24 *; | [XY]US2563851 (LUNDEEN CHESTER A, et al) [X] 1,3,6,19-24 * column 1, lines 1-3; figures 4,5,5a * * column 2, lines 35,49-52 * * column 4, lines 28-30 * [Y] 5,7,8; | [XY]US3334923 (PUTCH SAMUEL W) [X] 15 * figures 2,3 * [Y] 16; | [Y]US3722603 (BROWN C) [Y] 7 * when combined with US 2 563 851;; figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]DE4326298 (NORDMEYER KG [DE]) [A] 1-4,6,9-14,19-24 * column 1, lines 42-45,50-56; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9821443 (FRANK S INR INC [US]) [Y] 5,16 * relevant for claim 5 when combined with US 2 563 851 and for claim 16 when combined with US 3 334 923; page 9, lines 10,11,14,15; figure 4 *; | [A]US6237684 (BOULIGNY JR VERNON J [US], et al) [A] 8* figure 5 *; | [Y]US2002074132 (JUHASZ DANIEL [US], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0030] , [0031]; figures 5A,5B * |