EP1754943 - Extruded heat exchange element and its applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calorigen USA Corp 2895 Biscayne Boulevard 339 Miami FL 33137-4537 / US | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boussier, Jean-Jacques Urbanizacao Belavista, Lote No 17- Lanhoso 4830 331 Povoa de Lanhoso / PT | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5 Avenue de Saint Cloud B.P. 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Célanie, Christian Cabinet Célanie 5, avenue de Saint Cloud BP 214 78002 Versailles Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290008.9 | 04.01.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | FR20050008163 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0508163 | [2007/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754943 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/26, F28F1/20, F28F1/22, F24H3/02 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
F24D3/16 (EP);
F24S10/75 (EP);
F24S70/65 (EP);
F28F1/20 (EP);
F28F1/22 (EP);
F28D2021/0036 (EP);
F28F2255/16 (EP);
F28F2275/14 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] |
Former [2007/43] | |||
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Extrudiertes Wärmetauscherelement und seine Anwendungen | [2007/08] | English: | Extruded heat exchange element and its applications | [2007/08] | French: | Elément éxchangeur de température réalisé par extrusion et ses applications | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | EP06023974.6 / EP1757867 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.09.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | 27.09.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.09.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   10.10.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 05.08.2009 | Stay of proceedings | [2009/38] | 05.08.2009 | Stay of proceedings | [2010/09] | 01.04.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/09] | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | SAGEM COMMUNICATIONS Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc F-75512 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Date: | 22.09.2008 | [2009/09] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9742456 (SUNFIN TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,8-11,13,18,24 * the whole document * [Y] 4,7; | [XY]FR2561362 (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE [FR]) [X] 1-3,8-11,13,18,24 * page 7, line 19 - page 11, line 7; figures 1,2a,2b * [Y] 4,7; | [XY]FR2764162 (MULLER ET CIE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 31; figure 2 * [Y] 22,23; | [XY]GB672721 (UNGARISCHE RADIATOREN FABRIKS) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * [Y] 22,23; | [YX]GB2146422 (CRYOMEC AG) [Y] 4,7 * the whole document * [X] 14,15,18,20,25; | [Y]GB2385910 (HUTTON ANTHONY JOHN [GB]) [Y] 7 * abstract *; | [Y]US5501267 (IRITANI KUNIO [JP], et al) [Y] 22,23 * abstract *; | [X]GB2082310 (CRYOMEC AG) [X] 14,17,25 * page 2, line 16 - page 2, line 36; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE2308480 (VIESSMANN HANS) [X] 14,15,18,25 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [PX]EP1574791 (CEBI SPA [IT]) [PX] 14-16,18,25 * the whole document * |