Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
16.02.2010 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.11.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
03.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 05.08.2009 [2009/32] |
08.05.2009 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
27.03.2009 | Change - German title | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
13.03.2009 | Change - classification | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] |
27.01.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.02.2008 | Definitive list of designations | published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
25.01.2008 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
23.01.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.06.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |