Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007155431 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06290045 | 05.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1806942 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06290045 | 05.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100534057C | 26.08.2009 | C | CN101009622 | 01.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06290045 | 05.01.2006 |