EP1808491 - Genetically modified plant with modified storage protein content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERISTEM THERAPEUTICS S.A. 8, rue des Frères Lumière 63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Norre, Frederic 6, rue Bruchet 63800 Perignat sur Allier / FR | 02 /
Burtin, Daniel 4, rue de la Croix des Peyrouses 63430 Pont du Château / FR | 03 /
Marzabal, Pablo C/ Felipe II, n. 226, 7-2 08027 Barcelona / ES | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/03] |
Former [2007/29] | Colombet, Alain André Cabinet Lavoix 56 Avenue de Royat B.P. 27 63401 Chamalieres Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290094.9 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808491 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N5/10, A01H5/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
C12N15/8257 (EP);
C12N15/8251 (EP);
C12N15/8258 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/29] | Title | German: | Genetisch modifizierte Pflanze mit verändertem Gehalt an Reserveproteinen | [2007/29] | English: | Genetically modified plant with modified storage protein content | [2007/29] | French: | Plantes génétiquement modifiées avec une teneur modifiée d'une proteine seminale de stockage | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 08.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 15.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/08] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9850543 (BIOCEM S A [FR], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-59 * the whole document * * page 2 - page 9; example 15 * * examples 16-b *; | [X]US6329574 (LUNDQUIST RONALD C [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 122, line 48 - line 56; example 41 *; | [XY]EP1312672 (NAT INST OF AGROBIO SCIENCES [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7,13,18,19,29-34,39,40,50,53-59 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * claim 1 * * claim 6 * [Y] 1-3,6-59; | [Y]WO03052109 (DUERING KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-59 * page 2, paragraph 3 *; | [X]EP1577384 (INC ADMIN AGENCY NARO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6,7,13,18,19,29-34,39,40,50,53-59 * page 3, line 9 - line 16 * * page 3, line 29 - line 31 * * page 12, line 30 * * example 13; claim 24 * * claim 83 * * claim 90 * * claim 91 *; | [XY] - GOOSSENS A ET AL, "Co-introduction of an antisense gene for an endogenous seed storage protein can increase expression of a transgene in Arabidopsis thaliana seeds", FEBS LETTERS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990730), vol. 456, no. 1, ISSN 0014-5793, pages 160 - 164, XP004260058 [X] 1-3,6,7,13,18,19,29-34,39,40,50,53-59 * the whole document * * page 164, paragraph LAST * [Y] 1-3,6-59 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-5793(99)00943-6 | [X] - HARTWECK L M ET AL, "Altering protein composition by genetically removing phaseolin from common bean seeds containing arcelin or phytohemagglutinin", THEORETICAL AND APPLIED GENETICS, (199710), vol. 95, no. 5-6, ISSN 0040-5752, pages 1012 - 1017, XP002388474 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [DA] - SEGAL G ET AL, "A new opaque variant of maize by a single dominant RNA-interference-inducing transgene", GENETICS, GENETICS SOCIETY OF AMERICA, AUSTIN, TX, US, (200309), vol. 165, no. 1, ISSN 0016-6731, pages 387 - 397, XP002334753 [DA] * the whole document * | [DA] - HUNTER BRENDA G ET AL, "Maize opaque endosperm mutations create extensive changes in patterns of gene expression", PLANT CELL, (200210), vol. 14, no. 10, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 2591 - 2612, XP002388475 [DA] * the whole document * | [DA] - MIAO HONG-HE ET AL, "Construction of a trans-dominant inhibitor for members of the TGA family of transcription factors conserved in higher plants", PLANT JOURNAL, (1995), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 0960-7412, pages 887 - 896, XP002388476 [DA] * figure 2 * * page 894, column R, paragraph LAST * | [DA] - KODRZYCKI R ET AL, "THE OPAQUE-2 MUTATION OF MAIZE DIFFERENTIALLY REDUCES ZEIN GENE TRANSCRIPTION", PLANT CELL, (1989), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1040-4651, pages 105 - 114, XP002388477 [DA] * the whole document * |