EP1814073 - Method and device for processing a sequence of video images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourdon, Pascal Thomson 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 02 /
Blonde, Laurent Thomson 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | 03 /
Borel, Thierry Thomson 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Hays, Bertrand, et al Thomson 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/31] | Hays, Bertrand, et al Thomson 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290155.8 | 26.01.2006 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1814073 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T1/00, H04N5/74, H04N5/913 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (EP,US);
H04N2005/91392 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/15] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung der Videodaten einer Bildfolge | [2007/31] | English: | Method and device for processing a sequence of video images | [2007/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil de traitement d'une séquence d'images video | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0133846 (SARNOFF CORP [US]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [DX]EP1237369 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [DX] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0077] - [0085] * * paragraphs [0092] - [0111] *; | [A]EP1345428 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0045] * | by applicant | EP1237369 |