EP1819137 - Method of providing an automatic reply message [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonnaud, Fabrice 8, rue d'Amor 29260 Le Folgoet / FR | 02 /
Moitier, Pierrick 9, rue Boris Vian 29200 Brest / FR | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06290248.1 | 13.02.2006 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1819137 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1819137 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04M3/533 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
H04M3/53383 (EP,US);
H04L51/00 (EP,US);
H04M3/42017 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2072 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4509 (EP,US);
H04M2203/651 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/33] | H04M3/42, H04M3/50, H04L12/58, H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Bereitstellen einer automatischen Antwortnachricht | [2007/33] | English: | Method of providing an automatic reply message | [2007/33] | French: | Procédé pour fournir un message de réponse automatique | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 28.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.09.2010 | BE | 01.09.2010 | CY | 01.09.2010 | CZ | 01.09.2010 | DK | 01.09.2010 | EE | 01.09.2010 | FI | 01.09.2010 | HU | 01.09.2010 | IT | 01.09.2010 | LT | 01.09.2010 | LV | 01.09.2010 | NL | 01.09.2010 | PL | 01.09.2010 | RO | 01.09.2010 | SE | 01.09.2010 | SI | 01.09.2010 | SK | 01.09.2010 | TR | 01.09.2010 | BG | 01.12.2010 | GR | 02.12.2010 | ES | 12.12.2010 | IS | 01.01.2011 | PT | 03.01.2011 | IE | 13.02.2011 | LU | 13.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
TR | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
IE | 13.02.2011 | ||
LU | 13.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
BG | 01.12.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
IE | 13.02.2011 | ||
LU | 13.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
IE | 13.02.2011 | ||
LU | 13.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
IE | 13.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
DK | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
BE | 01.09.2010 | ||
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
IT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
RO | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
ES | 12.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
PT | 03.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2010 | ||
EE | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
SK | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
IS | 01.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
CY | 01.09.2010 | ||
FI | 01.09.2010 | ||
LT | 01.09.2010 | ||
LV | 01.09.2010 | ||
NL | 01.09.2010 | ||
PL | 01.09.2010 | ||
SE | 01.09.2010 | ||
SI | 01.09.2010 | ||
GR | 02.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 01.09.2010 | |
LT | 01.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9956450 (MANKOVITZ ROY J [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 24 - page 4, line 20 *; | [A]US2002015418 (UEMURA SHINICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0081] *; | [X]US2002090069 (YAKER RHODA [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]EP1331799 (AGERE SYST GUARDIAN CORP [US]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] *; | [X]US2003193558 (DOSS J SMITH [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] *; | [A]US6687340 (GOLDBERG RANDY G [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 36 - line 67 *; | [A]EP1511250 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] * |