EP1829991 - Stainless steel plate coated with self-cleaning coating. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UGINE & ALZ FRANCE Immeuble La Pacific, La Défense 7, 11/13 Cours Valmy 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damasse, Jean-Michel 192, place Lamartine 92400 Bethune / FR | 02 /
Charles, Jacques 21, résidence du Morambeau 71670 Le Breuil / FR | 03 /
Langlet, Michel 24, Les Tonnelles 38420 Le Versoud / FR | 04 /
Permpoon, Siriwan 99/207, Moobaan Thananon Rajchapreuk Rd. Bangkray 11000 Nonthaburi / TH | 05 /
Joud, Jean-Charles 10 Allée de la Praly 38240 Meylan / FR | 06 /
Baroux, Bernard 140 Impasse de Charafine 74410 Saint Jorioz / FR | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 Rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | Plaisant, Sophie Marie, et al ARCELOR France Arcelor Research Intellectual Property 5 rue Luigi Cherubini 93212 La Plaine Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290367.9 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1829991 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C23D5/00, C23D5/02, B01J21/06, B01J35/00 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
B01J37/0225 (EP,US);
C23C28/00 (EP,KR,US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J21/12 (EP,US);
B01J27/24 (EP,US);
B01J35/23 (EP,US);
B01J35/39 (EP,US);
B01J35/58 (EP,US);
B01J35/643 (EP,US);
B01J35/647 (EP,US);
B01J35/651 (EP,US);
B01J37/036 (EP,US);
C23C16/00 (KR);
C23C28/042 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24975 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249979 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | Rostfreies Stahlblech mit selbstreinigender Beschichtung. | [2007/36] | English: | Stainless steel plate coated with self-cleaning coating. | [2007/36] | French: | Tôle en acier inoxydable revêtue par un revêtement auto-nettoyant | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 12.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09228332 ; | [A]CN1522795 ; | [A]EP0850204 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1-29 * claims 1,2,15,16,21,22 *; | [A]EP1304366 (TOTO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * paragraphs [0092] - [0094]; claims 1-17 *; | [A]US2005221098 (AZZOPARDI MARIE-JOSE [FR], et al) [A] 1,3 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0010] - [0012] - [0015] - [0017] *; | [A]DE102004033620 (LIU WEN CHUAN [TW]) [A] 1,3 * figure .; claim 1 *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09228332 A 19970902 (TOTO LTD) [A] 1-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0018] , [0022] , [0024] , [0026] * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 79, Database accession no. 2004-797224, page 02, XP002392294 & CN1522795 A 20040825 (UNIV YUNNAN) [A] 1,3 * column A * |