EP1707097 - Mutli cyclone dust separating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Gwangju Electronics Co., Ltd. 271, Oseon-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Jung-gyun 501-1604, Hoban 5th Berdium Sinchang-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 02 /
Oh, Jang-keun 201-708, Haetae Apartment 385-1, Naebang-dong Seo-gu Gwangju-city / KR | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290377.8 | 07.03.2006 | [2006/40] | Priority number, date | US20050666092P | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 666092 P | KR20050039378 | 11.05.2005 Original published format: KR 2005039378 | [2006/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1707097 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1707097 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707097 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16, B04C5/04 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
A47L9/1683 (EP);
A47L9/1625 (EP);
A47L9/1641 (EP);
A47L9/165 (EP);
B04C5/04 (EP);
B04C5/185 (EP);
B04C5/24 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/40] | A47L9/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/15] |
Former [2006/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Staubsammelvorrichtung mit mehreren Zyklonen | [2006/40] | English: | Mutli cyclone dust separating apparatus | [2006/40] | French: | Collecteur de poussière à cyclones multiples | [2006/40] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 02.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005050864 (OH JANG-KEUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] *; | [A]GB2360719 (NOTETRY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 3, line 18 - page 12, line 22; figure 4a *; | [A]GB835884 (THEODORE RUFUS NAYLOR) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 100 *; | [A]US2002043055 (CONRAD WAYNE ERNEST [CA]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0017] * | by applicant | WO03062520 | US2005050864 |