EP1834996 - Pigment preparations based on PY 155 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schweikart, Karl-Heinz, Dr. Hauptstrasse 100 65760 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
Lerch, Jean-Philippe, Dr. 2, rue Thiebault Walter 68250 Rouffach / FR | 03 /
Pourcheron, Laurent 18, rue du Général de Gaulle 68440 Dietwiller / FR | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Hütter, Klaus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06290428.9 | 14.03.2006 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834996 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834996 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D17/00, C09B67/00 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
C09D17/003 (EP,US);
C09B67/008 (KR);
C09B67/0046 (EP,US);
C09B67/0055 (EP,US);
C09B67/0084 (KR);
C09B67/0085 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2009/02] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pigmentzubereitungen auf Basis von PY 155 | [2007/38] | English: | Pigment preparations based on PY 155 | [2007/38] | French: | Preparations pigmentaire a base de PY 155 | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005031163 ; | [X]JP2005338132 ; | [DX]EP0908789 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,2,5-16 * paragraph [0028]; claim 1 *; | [DX]GB2356634 (ILFORD IMAGING UK LTD [GB]) [DX] 1,2,5-16 * the whole document *; | [DX]GB2356866 (ILFORD IMAGING UK LTD [GB]) [DX] 1,2,5-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1329774 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-16 * example -; claim - *; | [X]DE10316402 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-16 * paragraph [0026]; example -; claim - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005031163 A 20050203 (CANON INC) [X] 1,2,5-16 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2005338132 A 20051208 (CANON INC) [X] 1,2,5-16 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2058849 | US3997521 | US4003886 | EP0076024 | US4461647 | JPH01241365 | GB2239254 | EP0908789 | GB2356634 | GB2356866 | WO2004029167 |