EP1710703 - Cache consistency in a shared-memory multiprocessor system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cousin, Jean-Philippe 1, rue Jules Ferry 38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Berenguer, Jean-José 6, Place Championnet 38000 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
Pelissier, Gilles 20, avenue du Grand Champ 38180 Seyssins / FR | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Gendron, Vincent Christian, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Bentz, Jean-Paul Novagraaf Technologies, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290497.4 | 29.03.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | FR20050003320 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0503320 | [2006/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1710703 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
G06F12/0831 (EP,US);
G06F12/084 (EP,US);
Y02D10/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/25] |
Former [2006/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Cache-Kohärenz in einem Multiprozessorsystem mit unterteiltem Speicher | [2006/41] | English: | Cache consistency in a shared-memory multiprocessor system | [2006/41] | French: | Cohérence de cache dans un système multiprocesseurs à mémoire partagée | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 08.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/09] | 21.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003120876 (HASS DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] , [0065] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0203] * * paragraph [0134] - paragraph [0168] *; | [A]US6874065 (PONG FONG [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 2 * * column 1, line 22 - column 2, line 54 * |