EP1742069 - INERTIAL SENSOR WITH REDUCED ERROR CURRENTS DUE TO REDUCED WIDTH AND DISTANCE OF CONDUCTORS IN CRITICAL ZONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/02] | Inertial sensor with reduced error currents due to reduced width and distance of conductors in critical zones | ||
[2014/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAGEM DEFENSE SECURITE 18-20 Quai du Point du Jour 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [2014/03] |
Former [2007/02] | For all designated states SAGEM Défense Sécurité Le Ponant de Paris 27 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brisson, Raphaël 17ter rue de la Station 92600 Asnieres sur Seine / FR | 02 /
Featonby, Paul 17 Keyes Gardens Newcastle-upon-tyne NE2 3RA / GB | [2007/02] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/36] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/02] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291012.0 | 21.06.2006 | [2007/02] | Priority number, date | FR20050007070 | 04.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0507070 | [2007/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1742069 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1742069 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1742069 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/09, G01P15/097, G01P15/10 | [2014/33] | CPC: |
G01P15/097 (EP,US);
G01P15/09 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/02] | G01P15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2007/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | INERTIALER SENSOR MIT REDUZIERTEN STÖRSTRÖMEN DURCH REDUKTION VON BREITE UND ABSTAND DER LEITERBAHNEN IN KRITISCHEN ZONEN | [2014/33] | English: | INERTIAL SENSOR WITH REDUCED ERROR CURRENTS DUE TO REDUCED WIDTH AND DISTANCE OF CONDUCTORS IN CRITICAL ZONES | [2014/33] | French: | Capteur inertiel a courant perturbateur reduit par reduction de la largeur et de l'ecartement des pistes dans les zones critiques | [2007/02] |
Former [2007/02] | Inertialer Sensor mit reduzierten Störströmen durch reduktion von Breite und Abstand der Leiterbahnen in kritischen Zonen | ||
Former [2007/02] | Inertial sensor with reduced error currents due to reduced width and distance of conductors in critical zones | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/22] | 08.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2006 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | IT | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.06.2006 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.06.2006 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
IT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2454614 (US ENERGY [US]) [A] 1* page 3, paragraph 2 - page 3, paragraph 5; figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6386035 (JANIAUD DENIS [FR], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, paragraph L - column 5, paragraph 1; figure 7b * * column 12, paragraph 2 - column 13, paragraph L *; | [A]EP1353185 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0016] , [0022] , [0029]; figure 1 *; | [AD]FR2842914 (SAGEM [FR]) [AD] 1 * figure 3; claims 1,7 *; | [A]EP1450164 (SAGEM [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0013] , [0018]; figure 1 * |