EP1744359 - Interconnect structure having cavities in its dielectric portion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ST Microelectronics Crolles 2 SAS 850 Rue Jean Monnet 38920 Crolles / FR | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states ST Microelectronics Crolles 2 SAS 850 Rue Jean Monnet 38920 Crolles / FR | ||
For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Torres, Joaquin 236 Chemin Fiancey 38950 St. Martin Le Vinoux / FR | 02 /
Gosset, Laurent-Georges 860 rue Jean Monnet 38920 Crolles / FR | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Verdure, Stéphane, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | Verdure, Stéphane, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291019.5 | 21.06.2006 | [2007/03] | Priority number, date | EP20050291505 | 12.07.2005 Original published format: EP 05291505 | [2007/22] |
Former [2007/03] | EP20050291505 | 13.07.2005 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744359 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/768 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
H01L23/5222 (EP);
H01L21/7682 (EP);
H01L21/76831 (EP);
H01L21/76849 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/38] |
Former [2007/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsstruktur mit Aushöhlungen in ihrem dielektrischen Bereich | [2007/03] | English: | Interconnect structure having cavities in its dielectric portion | [2007/03] | French: | Structure d'interconnexion ayant des cavités dans sa partie diélectrique | [2007/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/26] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/26] | Divisional application(s) | EP07112163.6 / EP1837905 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004102031 (KLOSTER GRANT M [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004099951 (PARK HYUN-MOG [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2004099952 (GOODNER MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]US2005087875 (FURUKAWA TOSHIHARU [US], et al) [A] * the whole document * |