EP1886926 - Construct for heating multiple food items in a microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cambay, Jean-Michel 10 Rue Roger Salengro 59191 Caullery / FR | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David, et al Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Marles, Alan David, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06291317.3 | 11.08.2006 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1886926 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/04, B65D5/48, B65D81/34 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
B65D81/3453 (EP,US);
B65D5/04 (EP,US);
B65D5/4804 (EP,US);
B65D2581/3494 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/43] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erhitzen von verschiedenen Nahrungsmitteln in einem Mikrowellenofen | [2008/07] | English: | Construct for heating multiple food items in a microwave oven | [2008/07] | French: | Structure pour le chauffage aux micro-ondes de plusieurs produits alimentaires | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1204221 (L. ROSSOMAN) [X] 1,20-24,28-32 * the whole document *; | [X]GB883238 (STIG BERTIL HOGDAL) [X] 1-4,7-9,13-17,20 * page 1, line 88 - page 2, line 31; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US4007836 (GETZ EDWARD J, et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,14,15,17,20,30-32 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 13; figures 4,5 *; | [X]WO9110339 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10-12,15,20,25-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US5077455 (PELEG YIGAL [US], et al) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [X]US5270066 (PAWLOWSKI THOMAS D [US]) [X] 1,5,6,8-16,18-20,25-27,29-31,33,34 * the whole document * |