EP1894950 - Aqueous dispersion of polymeric particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas France SAS 185 Rue De Bercy 75579 Paris, Cedex 12 / FR | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bompart, Marc 1150 route de Viaison 74930 Reignier / FR | 02 /
Brown, Ward T. 1203 Barbara's Court North Wales Pennsylvania 19454 / US | 03 /
Lauer, Rosemarie 101 Harrison Forge Court Chalfont Pennsylvania 18914 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Rohm & Haas France S.A., 185 Rue de Bercy 75579 Paris Cedex 12 / FR | ||
Former [2008/10] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Rohm and Haas France SAS, 185 Rue de Bercy 75579 Paris Cedex 12 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291398.3 | 31.08.2006 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1894950 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/00, C08F290/04, C08F265/00, C09D151/00, C08L51/00, C08F2/16 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08F265/00 (EP,US);
C08F290/00 (EP,US);
C08F290/04 (EP,US);
C09D151/003 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C09D151/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/46] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wässrige Dispersion von Polymerteilchen | [2008/10] | English: | Aqueous dispersion of polymeric particles | [2008/10] | French: | Dispersion aqueuse de particules polymériques. | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0520668 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * abstract * * page 2, lines 2-8 * * page 5, lines 29-33 * * page 3, lines 4-44,48 *; | [X]US5264530 (DARMON MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,4,6,17 * * column 3, lines 27-37 * * column 5, lines 26-33,57-59 * * column 9, lines 6-19; example - *; | [A]EP0658608 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 11 *; | [A]US5521266 (LAU WILLIE [US]) [A] 1-10 * column A * * column 2, line 26 - column 5, line 42 *; | [A]US5703169 (ZAJACZKOWSKI MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,3-9 *; | [A]US2002028232 (KUBOTA SUNAO [JP]) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0048] , [0049] , [0061] - [0063] *; | [X]WO0222755 (ROHM & HAAS [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 6, lines 11-18 * * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, lines 12-15 * * page 10, lines 1-9; example - * * page 26, lines 9-14 * * page 21, lines 1-30 * * page 25, line 11 *; | [X]US2004167269 (LAU WILLIE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * column A * * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0012] , [0035] , [0014] , [0017] , [0021] * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] , [0041] , [0050] , [0069] , [0074]; claim 13 * |