EP1808114 - Suction nozzle for vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Gwangju Electronics Co., Ltd. 271, Oseon-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oh, Jang-keun, c/o 201-708, Haetae Apartment 385-1, Naebang-dong, Seo-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 02 /
Han, Jung-gyun, c/o 501-1604, Hoban 5th Verdium Sinchang-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | 03 /
Lim, Soon-tack, 102-1106, Siyoung Apartment Gusan-dong Kimhae-si, Kyungsangnam-do / KR | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291532.7 | 29.09.2006 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | KR20060003077 | 11.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060003077 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808114 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808114 | Date: | 09.06.2010 | [2010/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/02, A47L9/04 | [2010/23] | CPC: |
A47L9/02 (EP,US);
H02K33/16 (KR);
A47L9/04 (EP,US);
A47L9/0416 (EP,US);
A47L9/0433 (EP,US);
A47L9/0472 (EP,US);
H02K33/02 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | A47L9/02 | Designated contracting states | [2011/07] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Saugdüse eines Staubsaugers | [2007/29] | English: | Suction nozzle for vacuum cleaner | [2007/29] | French: | Buse d'aspiration pour aspirateur | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 10.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/26] | 04.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH11128126 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * [Y] 8-12 [I] 6; | [XI]US2027544 (EINAR LOFGREN GOSTAF) [X] 1,3-5 * page 1, column 1, line 41 - page 2, column 1, line 14; figure - * [I] 2,6; | [XI]GB2388306 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [X] 1,8-10,12 * page 2, line 14 - page 5, line 25; figure - * [I] 6; | [XI]US2556022 (AMEN ATIYEH) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 13-30; figure - * [I] 6; | [XI]US2921331 (CLARENCE STEVENS) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 35; figures 1,2 * [I] 6; | [XI]DE1017346 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-3 * column 1; figure - * [I] 6; | [XI]JPH1142181 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 6; | [Y]US2003221281 (OH JANG-KEUN [KR]) [Y] 8-12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figure - * |