EP1915934 - Multiple roll dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA TISSUE FRANCE 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [2013/14] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Georgia-Pacific France 11, route Industrielle 68320 Kunheim / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuger, Maurice 92A, rue du Général de Gaulle 68204 Kaysersberg / FR | 02 /
Neveu, Jean-Louis 26, avenue Frédéric Mistral 06530 Peymeinade / FR | 03 /
Pommier, Nicolas 6, rue Morel 68000 Colmar / FR | 04 /
Smaïli, Nourddine 50, route de Bâle 68000 Colmar / FR | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Cortier, Sophie, et al SCA TISSUE FRANCE Département Brevets 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Cortier, Sophie, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2008/18] | Thomas, Nadine Georgia-Pacific France 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291658.0 | 25.10.2006 | [2008/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915934 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915934 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47K10/38, // A47K10/32 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
A47K10/3827 (EP,US);
A47K2010/326 (EP,US);
A47K2010/3863 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Spender für mehrere Rollen | [2008/18] | English: | Multiple roll dispenser | [2008/18] | French: | Distributeur multi-rouleaux | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2006 | AT | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | IE | 25.10.2012 | LU | 25.10.2012 | CH | 31.10.2012 | LI | 31.10.2012 | MC | 31.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
LU | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 25.10.2012 | ||
CH | 31.10.2012 | ||
LI | 31.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/24] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4137130 (NIETHAMMER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 12 * * column 5, line 30 - line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [X]WO0164525 (SZILAS GIDEON [IL], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * page 3, line 23 - page 5, line 3; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0286498 (SONOCO PRODUCTS CO [US]) [X] 1,6 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0287545 (HOLMENS BRUK AB [SE]) [A] 1 * figure 2 * |