EP1930843 - Backing film adapted for preventing electronic module electrostatic discharges and method of manufacturing a module implementing the backing film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nérot, Dorothée c/o Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Fortel, Julien c/o Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 03 /
Thuillard, Sardrine c/o Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 04 /
Laknin, Mourad c/o Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Fragnaud, Aude, et al Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92197 Meudon Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Fragnaud, Aude, et al Axalto S.A. 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291896.6 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930843 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, H01L23/498, H05K3/24 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
H01L23/49855 (EP);
H01L23/60 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H05K1/0259 (EP);
H05K1/0393 (EP);
H05K2201/09354 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/08] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schichtträger, der zur Vorbeugung der elektrostatischen Entladung von elektronischen Modulen dient, und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Moduls, bei dem der Schichtträger zum Einsatz kommt | [2008/24] | English: | Backing film adapted for preventing electronic module electrostatic discharges and method of manufacturing a module implementing the backing film | [2008/24] | French: | Film-support adapté a la prévention de décharge électrostatique de module électronique et procédé de fabrication de module mettant en oeuvre le film-support | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/22] | 05.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/22] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2439438 (CII HONEYWELL BULL) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0737025 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 5,6; | [A]DE3809005 (HITACHI SEMICONDUCTOR EUROP GM [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2844421 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2795907 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |