EP1798812 - Easy-manufacturing antenna with dielectric structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouche, Guillaume 1 rue du Palais 38000 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Montusclat, Sébastien 6 Résidence Saint-Mury 38240 Meylan / FR | 03 /
Gloria, Daniel 53 bis, rue Pierre Semard 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Novagraaf Technologies 122 Rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Bentz, Jean-Paul, et al Novagraaf Technologies, 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291944.4 | 15.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | FR20050012768 | 15.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0512768 | [2007/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1798812 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q9/44, H01Q9/04, H01Q1/38 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
H01Q9/44 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0485 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/09] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einfacher hergestellte Antenne mit dielektrischer Struktur | [2007/25] | English: | Easy-manufacturing antenna with dielectric structure | [2007/25] | French: | Antenne à structure diélectrique de fabrication simplifiée | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 21.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 20.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/46] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO03030252 (HRL LAB LLC [US]) [X] 1-4,15 * page 7, line 18 - page 10, line 28; figures 1,2 * * page 15, line 4 - line 11; figure 5 * [Y] 6-10,12,13; | [A]FR2849221 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 10 - line 28 *; | [Y] - GUO Y-X ET AL, "ON IMPROVING COUPLING BETWEEN A COPLANAR WAVEGUIDE FEED AND A DIELECTRIC RESONATOR ANTENNA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200308), vol. 51, no. 8, ISSN 0018-926X, pages 2144 - 2146, XP001169708 [Y] 6-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TAP.2003.814740 | [Y] - KISHK A A ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "Application of rotated sequential feeding for circular polarization bandwidth enhancement of planar arrays with single-fed dra elements", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. 2003 DIGEST. APS. COLUMBUS, OH, JUNE 22 - 27, 2003, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030622), VOL. 4 OF 4, ISBN 0-7803-7846-6, pages 664 - 667, XP010651334 [Y] 12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/APS.2003.1220361 | [Y] - PETOSA A ET AL, "RECENT ADVANCES IN DIELECTRIC-RESONATOR ANTENNA TECHNOLOGY", IEEE ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199806), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 1045-9243, pages 35 - 48, XP000774845 [Y] 13 * Section 4.1.3 DRAs for circular polarization, Fig. 10a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/74.706069 | [A] - PUSCASU I ET AL, "Near-infrared transmission and emission characteristics of frequency selective surfaces and its nano-fabrication issues", CONFERENCE ON LASERS AND ELECTRO-OPTICS. (CLEO 2001). TECHNICAL DIGEST. POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. BALTIMORE, MD, MAY 6-11, 2001, TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS. (TOPS), US, WASHINGTON, WA : OSA, US, (20010506), VOL. 56, ISBN 1-55752-662-1, pages 212 - 212, XP010559748 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLEO.2001.947718 |