Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1806955
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.08.2018 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
15.05.2018 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.02.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.11.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.11.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.02.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
30.01.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2008 |
First examination report |
|
15.01.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.12.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] |
08.06.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |