Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7449846 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2008 | B2 | US2007152602 | 05.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0600095 | 05.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5193469B | Global Dossier | 08.05.2013 | B2 | JP2007185093 | 19.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0600095 | 05.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1806955 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0600095 | 05.01.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2896121 | 15.07.2011 | B1 | FR2896121 | 13.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0600095 | 05.01.2006 |