EP1826446 - Brake device for vehicle wheel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Delayre, Xavier 19, rue Carle Hébert 92400, COURBEVOIE / FR | 02 /
Padiolleau, Eric 16, résidence des Terres Rouges 91120, PALAISEAU / FR | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Laget, Jean-Loup Brema-Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/32] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet PEUSCET 161 Rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/35] | Laget, Jean-Loup Cabinet PEUSCET 161, rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300155.6 | 22.02.2006 | [2007/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826446 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16D55/22 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
F16D55/22 (EP);
F16D65/095 (EP);
F16D2055/0016 (EP);
F16D2055/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/19] |
Former [2007/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bremsvorrichtung für Kraftfahrzeugrad | [2007/35] | English: | Brake device for vehicle wheel | [2007/35] | French: | Système de freinage pour roue de véhicule automobile | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 01.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 14.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003127290 (SEVERINSSON LARS [SE], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO0192749 (BPW BERGISCHE ACHSEN KG [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 7 - page 8; figures 4-6 *; | [X]DE19822606 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-11 * figures 1,11,12 *; | [X]US4749066 (GARRETT WAYNE H [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * |