EP1830573 - Method and apparatus for determining in picture signal encoding the bit allocation for groups of pixel blocks in a picture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Zhi Bo 8F, Bldg. A, Technology Fortune Center 8 Xue Qin 100085, Beijing / CN | 02 /
Gu, Xiao Dong Rm 03-09, 8F, Bldg A Technology Fortune Center 8 100085, Beijing / CN | 03 /
Chen, Qu Qing 8F, Bldg. A, Technology Fortune Center 8 Xue Qin 100085, Beijing / CN | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG Karl-Wiechert-Allee 1D 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Hartnack, Wolfgang Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 06300184.6 | 02.03.2006 | [2007/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1830573 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/26 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
H04N19/192 (EP,US);
H04N19/60 (KR);
H04N19/124 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,US);
H04N19/149 (EP,US);
H04N19/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/20] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Bitzuweisung für Pixelblockgruppen in der Bildsignalkodierung in einem Bild | [2007/36] | English: | Method and apparatus for determining in picture signal encoding the bit allocation for groups of pixel blocks in a picture | [2007/36] | French: | Procédé et appareil de détermination, dans une image, du signal codant l'affectation des bits pour des groupes de blocs de pixels dans une image | [2007/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/36] | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - WEI LAI ET AL, "A content-based bit allocation model for video streaming", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2004. ICME '04. 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TAIPEI, TAIWAN JUNE 27-30, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040627), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-8603-5, pages 1315 - 1318, XP010771069 [AD] 1-9 * page 1316, column R, paragraph 2 - page 1317, column R, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICME.2004.1394469 | [AD] - HE Z ET AL, "A LINEAR SOURCE MODEL AND A UNIFIED RATE CONTROL ALGORITHM FOR DCT VIDEO CODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS FOR VIDEO TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200211), vol. 12, no. 11, ISSN 1051-8215, pages 970 - 982, XP001133428 [AD] 1-9 * page 971, column L, paragraph 2 - page 972, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSVT.2002.805511 | [AD] - CHIH-WEI TANG ET AL, "A novel visual distortion sensitivity analysis for video encoder bit allocation", IMAGE PROCESSING, 2004. ICIP '04. 2004 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SINGAPORE 24-27 OCT. 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041024), ISBN 0-7803-8554-3, pages 3225 - 3228, XP010786484 [AD] 1-9 * page 3227, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2004.1421800 | [AD] - SENGUPTA S ET AL, "Perceptually motivated bit-allocation for H.264 encoded video sequences", PROCEEDINGS 2003 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. ICIP-2003. BARCELONA, SPAIN, SEPT. 14 - 17, 2003, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030914), VOL. 2 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7750-8, pages 797 - 800, XP010669954 [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * |