EP1703547 - Method and device for controlling the contamination of wafer substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adixen Vacuum Products 98 Avenue de Brogny 74009 Annecy / FR | [2011/41] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/38] | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Favre, Arnaud / 17bis, avenue de Novel 74000, ANNECY / FR | 02 /
Thollot, Rémi / 196, rue du Mont Blanc 74350, CRUSEILLES / FR | 03 /
Metais, Xavier 3, rue Fançois Vernex 74960 Meythet / FR | 04 /
Desbiolles, Jean-Pierre / Les Follats 74350, CRUSEILLES / FR | [2011/37] |
Former [2006/38] | 01 /
Favre, Arnaud 17bis, avenue de Novel 74000, ANNECY / FR | ||
02 /
Thollot, Rémi 196, rue du Mont Blanc 74350, CRUSEILLES / FR | |||
03 /
Metais, Xavier 3, rue Fançois Vernex 74960 Meythet / FR | |||
04 /
Desbiolles, Jean-Pierre Les Follats 74350, CRUSEILLES / FR | Representative(s) | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob Cabinet Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [2011/21] | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob Cabinet Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | ||
Former [2008/46] | Chaffraix, Sylvain Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/38] | Chaffraix, Sylvain COMPAGNIE FINANCIERE ALCATEL Département Propriété Industrielle 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300207.5 | 07.03.2006 | [2006/38] | Priority number, date | FR20050050703 | 18.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0550703 | [2006/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1703547 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1703547 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1703547 | Date: | 14.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/37] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1703547 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00 | [2006/38] | CPC: |
H01L21/67253 (EP,US);
F24F12/003 (KR);
F24F13/28 (KR);
F24F13/30 (KR);
F24F7/08 (KR);
H01L21/67389 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle der Verunreinigung von Wafersubstraten | [2006/38] | English: | Method and device for controlling the contamination of wafer substrates | [2006/38] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le contrôle de la contamination des plaquettes de substrat | [2006/38] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2006 | AT | 14.09.2011 | CY | 14.09.2011 | CZ | 14.09.2011 | DK | 14.09.2011 | EE | 14.09.2011 | FI | 14.09.2011 | LT | 14.09.2011 | LV | 14.09.2011 | NL | 14.09.2011 | PL | 14.09.2011 | RO | 14.09.2011 | SE | 14.09.2011 | SI | 14.09.2011 | SK | 14.09.2011 | TR | 14.09.2011 | BG | 14.12.2011 | GR | 15.12.2011 | ES | 25.12.2011 | IS | 14.01.2012 | PT | 16.01.2012 | LU | 07.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
LU | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
TR | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
BG | 14.12.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
ES | 25.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
DK | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
PL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
EE | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
NL | 14.09.2011 | ||
RO | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
SK | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
PT | 16.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
IS | 14.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
CY | 14.09.2011 | ||
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 14.09.2011 | |
FI | 14.09.2011 | ||
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
LV | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
SI | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
SE | 14.09.2011 | ||
GR | 15.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 14.09.2011 | |
LT | 14.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 14.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5233191 (NOGUCHI MINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * abstract *; | [A]US6287023 (YAEGASHI HIDETAMI [JP], et al) [A] 1,23 * abstract *; | [DA]DE10133520 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1-28* abstract *; | [DA]US2004023419 (KISHKOVICH OLEG P [US], et al) [DA] 1-28 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10133520 | US2004023419 |