EP1728953 - Hinges of a sliding side door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chereau, Pierre 11, rue Guynemer 92330 Sceaux / FR | 02 /
Ollivier, Jean-Louis 55, rue Nicolas Ledoux 78960 Voisins Le Bretonneux / FR | 03 /
Leray, Fabrice 134, rue Lecourbe 75015 Paris / FR | 04 /
Le Griffon, Jean-Bernard Hildebrandtstrasse 17 85057 Ingolstadt / DE | [2006/49] | Application number, filing date | 06300274.5 | 23.03.2006 | [2006/49] | Priority number, date | FR20050005640 | 03.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0505640 | [2006/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1728953 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/10 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
E05D15/1047 (EP);
E05D2015/1026 (EP);
E05Y2201/22 (EP);
E05Y2900/531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Title | German: | Scharniere einer Seitenschiebetür | [2006/49] | English: | Hinges of a sliding side door | [2006/49] | French: | Charnières de porte latérale coulissante | [2006/49] | Examination procedure | 25.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 22.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/47] | 04.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1082525 (WEGMANN & CO) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US3935674 (WILLIAMS ALVERSON B, et al) [A] 1-10 * figure - *; | [A]US4110934 (ZENS JOHN F) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 1 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR2590618 (PAUMELLERIE ELECTRIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-10* abstract *; | [A]FR2658762 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2658762 |