EP1712858 - Process and installation for cooling water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, quai d'Orsay 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2006/42] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE S.A. 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubettier-Grenier, Richard 1 bis avenue de Bruzza 94210, La Varenne Saint Hilaire / FR | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A. Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/42] | Pittis, Olivier L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300287.7 | 27.03.2006 | [2006/42] | Priority number, date | FR20050050907 | 08.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0550907 | [2006/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1712858 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1712858 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F25J3/04 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
F28C3/06 (EP);
F25J3/0219 (EP);
F25J3/0223 (EP);
F25J3/0252 (EP);
F25J3/0266 (EP);
F25J3/04157 (EP);
F25J3/04284 (EP);
F25J3/04309 (EP);
F25J3/04612 (EP);
F25J3/04636 (EP);
B01D2256/22 (EP);
B01D2259/40001 (EP);
B01D53/047 (EP);
B01D53/0476 (EP);
F25J2205/30 (EP);
F25J2205/34 (EP);
F25J2205/40 (EP);
F25J2205/60 (EP);
F25J2205/64 (EP);
F25J2210/12 (EP);
F25J2210/80 (EP);
F25J2215/04 (EP);
F25J2220/82 (EP);
F25J2260/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anlage zum Kühlen von Wasser | [2006/42] | English: | Process and installation for cooling water | [2006/42] | French: | Procédé et installation de refroidissement de l'eau | [2006/42] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | CZ | 02.04.2008 | DK | 02.04.2008 | EE | 02.04.2008 | FI | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | LT | 02.04.2008 | LV | 02.04.2008 | SI | 02.04.2008 | SK | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | BG | 02.07.2008 | SE | 02.07.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | IS | 02.08.2008 | PT | 03.09.2008 | HU | 03.10.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
GR | 03.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
HU | 03.10.2008 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
GR | 03.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
CZ | 02.04.2008 | ||
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
EE | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 02.04.2008 | |
DK | 02.04.2008 | ||
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LT | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
SK | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 02.04.2008 | |
FI | 02.04.2008 | ||
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
SE | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
IS | 02.08.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 02.04.2008 | |
LV | 02.04.2008 | ||
SI | 02.04.2008 | ||
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
PT | 03.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 02.04.2008 | |
BG | 02.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 02.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4639257 (DUCKETT MELVYN [GB], et al) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [A]US5505050 (ARRIULOU PASCAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]US6295838 (SHAH MINISH MAHENDRA [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document * |