EP1714578 - Storage and application device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramet, Marc 16, rue Gambetta 92600 Asnières / FR | 02 /
Crosnier, Daniel décédé / FR | [2008/15] |
Former [2006/43] | 01 /
Ramet, Marc 16 rue Gambetta 92600 Asnières / FR | ||
02 /
Crosnier, Daniel décédé / FR | Representative(s) | Tanty, François Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/43] | Tanty, François Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300354.5 | 11.04.2006 | [2006/43] | Priority number, date | FR20050050979 | 18.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0550979 | [2006/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1714578 | Date: | 25.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1714578 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, B65D51/32 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
A45D34/046 (EP,US);
A45D34/047 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/43] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufbewahren und Auftragen | [2006/43] | English: | Storage and application device | [2006/43] | French: | Dispositif de conditionnement et d'application | [2006/43] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/43] | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.08.2008 | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IE | 06.08.2008 | LT | 06.08.2008 | LV | 06.08.2008 | NL | 06.08.2008 | PL | 06.08.2008 | RO | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | SE | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | IS | 06.12.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | LU | 11.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
LU | 11.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
LU | 11.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
GR | 07.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
SE | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IE | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 06.08.2008 | |
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 06.08.2008 | |
NL | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0349407 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,13,14,16,17,19,22-26 * column 4, line 1 - line 23 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 15 * * column 6, line 62 - column 7, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *; | [AD]EP0350535 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1 * column 3, line 45 - column 5, line 44 * * figure 19 *; | [X]EP0465278 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 10 - line 42 * * column 7, line 13 - line 40 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]EP0931476 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0041] , [0043] ** figure 2 * |