EP1848135 - Multislot packet data transfer method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | [2011/09] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBREUILLE, Julien / Les allées du Golf F-119 31840, Seilh / FR | 02 /
BOUVET, Cyril / 14 rue Condorcet 31400, Toulouse / FR | 03 /
MARCO, Olivier / 61 Avenue de l'URSS 31400, Toulouse / FR | [2012/08] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
DUBREUILLE, Julien Les allées du Golf F-119 31840, Seilh / FR | ||
02 /
BOUVET, Cyril 14 rue Condorcet 31400, Toulouse / FR | |||
03 /
MARCO, Olivier 61 Avenue de l'URSS 31400, Toulouse / FR | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06300378.4 | 19.04.2006 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848135 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848135 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04W88/02 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
H04W52/287 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,KR,US);
H04B7/2656 (KR);
H04W88/02 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | H04J3/06, H04Q7/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur mehrfachzeitschlitzigen Paket-Datenübertragung | [2007/43] | English: | Multislot packet data transfer method | [2007/43] | French: | Procédé de transfert multi-créneau de données par paquets | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.04.2006 | AT | 22.02.2012 | BE | 22.02.2012 | CY | 22.02.2012 | CZ | 22.02.2012 | DK | 22.02.2012 | EE | 22.02.2012 | FI | 22.02.2012 | LT | 22.02.2012 | LV | 22.02.2012 | PL | 22.02.2012 | RO | 22.02.2012 | SE | 22.02.2012 | SI | 22.02.2012 | SK | 22.02.2012 | TR | 22.02.2012 | IE | 19.04.2012 | LU | 19.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | BG | 22.05.2012 | GR | 23.05.2012 | ES | 02.06.2012 | IS | 22.06.2012 | PT | 22.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 19.04.2012 | ||
LU | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
TR | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
BG | 22.05.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
ES | 02.06.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
IE | 19.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 22.02.2012 | |
BE | 22.02.2012 | ||
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
SK | 22.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 22.02.2012 | ||
DK | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
PL | 22.02.2012 | ||
RO | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
SI | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
EE | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
SE | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
CY | 22.02.2012 | ||
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
LV | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 22.02.2012 | |
FI | 22.02.2012 | ||
LT | 22.02.2012 | ||
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
PT | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
GR | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 22.02.2012 | |
IS | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 22.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004152478 (RUOHONEN JARI J [FI], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0008] , [0010] , [0029] , [0048] , [0051] , [0052] , [0055] - [0058] *; | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Radio subsystem link control (3GPP TS 45.008 version 6.12.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 145 008", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200504), vol. 3-G1, no. V6120, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014028369 [A] 1-16 * section 10.1.1.2 * | [A] - ERICSSON, NORTEL, ALCATEL, "Combination of Extended Dynamic Allocation and USF-GRANULARITY=4", 3GPP TSG-GERAN WG2 MEETING #17, Budapest, Hungary, no. GP-032564, (20031117), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_geran/TSG_GERAN/GERAN_17_Budapest/Docs/, (20060904), XP002397613 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Clarification to Extended Dynamic Allocation for High Multislot Classes", 3GPP TSG-GERAN WG2 MEETING #16, New York, USA, no. GP-032183, (20030825), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_geran/TSG_GERAN/GERAN_16_NewYork/Docs/, (20060904), XP002397614 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004152478 |