EP1862169 - Use of cis-rhenium (III) diadamantate compounds for potentiating the antitumoral activity of platinum complexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE COORDINATION DE RECHERCHES THERAPEUTIQUES 30 Avenue du Port 20220 Algajola / FR | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collery Philippe Orezza 2, Immeuble les mimosas, Quartier Toga 20200 Bastia / FR | 02 /
Shtemenko, Alexander V. 149/28 Gargarin Avenue 49107 Dnepropetrovsk / UA | 03 /
Shtemenko, Natalia I. 149/28 Gargarin Avenue 49107 Dnepropetrovsk / UA | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [2007/49] | Application number, filing date | 06300497.2 | 19.05.2006 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1862169 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/24, A61P35/00 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
A61K31/555 (EP);
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/555, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/33] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verwendung von cis-Rhenium(III)diadamantat-Verbindungen zur Potenzierung der antitumoralen Aktivität von Platinkomplexen | [2007/49] | English: | Use of cis-rhenium (III) diadamantate compounds for potentiating the antitumoral activity of platinum complexes | [2007/49] | French: | Utilisation des composés de cis-rhénium(III) diadamantate pour renforcer l'activité antitumorale des complexes de platine | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/01] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ZABITSKAYA E D ET AL, "Blood proteins under metal-organic substances treatment", FEBS JOURNAL, & 30TH CONGRESS OF THE FEDERATION-OF-EUROPEAN-BIOCHEMICAL-SOCIETIES (FEBS)/9TH IUBMB CONFERENCE; BUDAPEST, HUNGARY; JULY 02 -07, 2005, (200507), vol. 272, no. Suppl. 1, ISSN 1742-464X(print) 1742-4658(ele, pages 503 - 504, XP002408174 [A] * abstract * | [A] - YAN Y-K ET AL, "Cytotoxicity of rhenium(I) alkoxo and hydroxo carbonyl complexes in murine and human tumor cells", PHARMAZIE 2000 GERMANY, (2000), vol. 55, no. 4, ISSN 0031-7144, pages 307 - 313, XP001149202 [A] * the whole document * |