EP1767113 - Modular jewelry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2009 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orest Group 28, rue de l'Expansion Zone Industrielle 67150 Erstein / FR | [2008/36] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states SOCIETE NOUVELLE OR EST, Société Anonyme 28, rue de l'Expansion Zone Industrielle 67150 Erstein / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schurz, Joël 4, rue de la Schlitte 67190 Urmatt / FR | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | ||
Former [2007/13] | Rhein, Alain Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17, rue de la Forêt 67550 Vendenheim / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300983.1 | 26.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | FR20050052877 | 26.09.2005 Original published format: FR 0552877 | [2007/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767113 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1767113 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/32] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1767113 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A44C13/00 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
A44C13/00 (EP);
A44C9/0023 (EP);
A44D2203/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Modulares Schmuckstück | [2007/13] | English: | Modular jewelry | [2007/13] | French: | Bijou modulaire | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 06.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.08.2008 | CZ | 06.08.2008 | DK | 06.08.2008 | EE | 06.08.2008 | FI | 06.08.2008 | IT | 06.08.2008 | LT | 06.08.2008 | LV | 06.08.2008 | PL | 06.08.2008 | RO | 06.08.2008 | SI | 06.08.2008 | SK | 06.08.2008 | TR | 06.08.2008 | BG | 06.11.2008 | GR | 07.11.2008 | IS | 06.12.2008 | PT | 06.01.2009 | HU | 07.02.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | CY | 06.08.2008 | |
CZ | 06.08.2008 | ||
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
TR | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
HU | 07.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
PL | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
EE | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 06.08.2008 | |
DK | 06.08.2008 | ||
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
RO | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
SK | 06.08.2008 | ||
BG | 06.11.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
PT | 06.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 06.08.2008 | |
FI | 06.08.2008 | ||
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 06.08.2008 | |
LT | 06.08.2008 | ||
LV | 06.08.2008 | ||
SI | 06.08.2008 | ||
IS | 06.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 06.08.2008 | |
IS | 06.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2254289 (MARTIN CHARLES HENRY [FR]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 42; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]US5921110 (MIDDENDORFF SUZANNE B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,18 * column 7, line 11 - column 7, line 26 * [A] 6,8-17; | [A]FR2781990 (LATEST CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-18 * page 5, line 24 - page 8, line 22; figures 1-8 *; | [AD]US2004079111 (HARTGROVE RONALD W [US]) [AD] 1-18 * page 2, paragraph 25 - page 4, paragraph 48; figures 1,2,3A,3B,4A,4B *; | [A]US2004126621 (FUKUDA SHIGEO [JP]) [A] 1-18* page 4, paragraph 73 - page 5, paragraph 87; figures 1-13 * |