EP1772573 - Multi-storey plant for automatic parking of vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bousseau, Françoise 8, Rue du Drillais 85130 La Gaubretiere / FR | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bousseau, Jean 15 rue de Villers 9657 Harlange / LU | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phélip 7, rue de Madrid 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06301018.5 | 05.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | FR20050010216 | 06.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0510216 | [2007/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772573 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/24, E04H6/18 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
E04H6/24 (EP);
E04H6/183 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Title | German: | Mehrgeschossige Anlage für das automatische Parken von Fahrzeugen | [2007/15] | English: | Multi-storey plant for automatic parking of vehicles | [2007/15] | French: | Installation à niveaux multiples pour le stationnement automatique de véhicules | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 06.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9309316 (ERIKSSON SVEN TORD [SE], et al) [A] 1-5,8 * page 10, line 16 - page 18, line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2752051 (STRAHM ALLEN D, et al) [A] 1-5,7-11 * column 2, line 30 - column 8, line 20; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US4986714 (FERNSTROEM GOERAN [SE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |