Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1793147 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2009 | B1 | EP1793147 | 05.03.2008 | A3 | EP1793147 | 06.06.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | FR0553633 | 30.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE440236T | 15.09.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR0553633 | 30.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006008558D1 | 01.10.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR0553633 | 30.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2893994 | 28.12.2007 | B1 | FR2893994 | 01.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0553633 | 30.11.2005 |