EP1795233 - Cosmetic composition comprising an ester of dimerdilinoleic acid and polyol and a silicon containing surfactant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Momoko 1-5-201, Jingumae 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0001 / JP | 02 /
Tokunaga, Emiko 2-14-15-3E Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-city Kanagawa 213-0006 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony & Associés, 3 rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06301224.9 | 07.12.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | FR20050053797 | 08.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0553797 | [2007/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1795233 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1795233 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/06, A61K8/37, A61K8/894 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
A61Q1/06 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61K8/894 (EP);
A61K2800/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammentsetzung enthaltend ein Ester aus Dimerdilinoleylsäure und Polyol und eine Silikon enthaltendes Tenside | [2007/24] | English: | Cosmetic composition comprising an ester of dimerdilinoleic acid and polyol and a silicon containing surfactant | [2007/24] | French: | Composition cosmétique comprenant un ester d'acide dimerdilinoléique et de polyol(s) et un agent tensioactif siliconé | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/19] | 14.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2795309 (NIPPON FINE CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-37 * example -; claim - * * page 8, line 10 - line 21 * * page 18, line 19 - line 25 * * page 1, line 11 - line 21 * * page 8, line 10 - line 21 * * page 11, line 1 - line 11 *; | [X]DE10060056 (GOLDWELL GMBH [DE]) [X] 10-13,18-23,25,27-33 * example 2; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1496080 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [Y] 1-37 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; claim - *; | [P]EP1640040 (OREAL [FR]) [P] 1-37 * paragraphs [0015] - [0017] - [0137]; claim - *; | [XD]JP2004256515 ; | [X]JP2002128623 ; | [X]JP2005104854 ; | [X]JP2004269397 ; | [X]JP2004269396 ; | [X]JP2002128629 ; | [X]JP2002128628 ; | [XD]JP2005179377 | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 67, Database accession no. 2004-680318, XP002399103 & JP2004256515 A 20040916 (NIPPON SEIKA KK) [XD] 1-37 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 51, Database accession no. 2002-475555, XP002399105 & JP2002128623 A 20020509 (KOSE KK) [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 33, Database accession no. 2005-319212, XP002399107 & JP2005104854 A 20050421 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 69, Database accession no. 2004-702998, XP002399109 & JP2004269397 A 20040930 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 68, Database accession no. 2004-694141, XP002399110 & JP2004269396 A 20040930 (KANEBO LTD) [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 52, Database accession no. 2002-484157, XP002399111 & JP2002128629 A 20020509 (KOSE KK) [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 52, Database accession no. 2002-484156, XP002399112 & JP2002128628 A 20020509 (KOSE KK) [X] 1-37 * abstract * | [XD] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 65, Database accession no. 2005-632594, XP002399305 & JP2005179377 A 20050707 (KOKYU ARUKORU KOGYO KK) [XD] 1-37 * abstract * |