EP1736084 - Cooker with food stirring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEB SA Les 4M Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states SEB SA Les 4M, Chemin du Petit Bois 69130 Ecully / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pellerin, Olivier Rue Palluet 21510 Minot / FR | 02 /
Payen, Jean-Marc 95, Rue des Charrières 21800 Quetigny / FR | 03 /
Sobole, Céline 7, Rue des Colverts 21490 Clenay / FR | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | Kiehl, Hubert SEB Développement, Les 4 M-Chemin du Petit Bois, B.P. 172 69134 Ecully Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06356069.2 | 16.06.2006 | [2006/52] | Priority number, date | FR20050006332 | 22.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506332 | [2006/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1736084 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/12, A47J27/00, A47J27/10, A47J36/18, A47J36/20 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A47J27/004 (EP);
A47J36/18 (EP);
A47J36/20 (EP);
A47J37/129 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Title | German: | Kocher mit einer Vorrichtung zum Umrühren von Nahrungsmitteln | [2006/52] | English: | Cooker with food stirring device | [2006/52] | French: | Cuiseur à panier de cuisson, comportant un système de remuage des aliments | [2006/52] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 07.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6055901 (GANTOS JILL L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 16; figure 4 * [Y] 3,11-13; | [DYA]WO2004002280 (DE LONGHI SPA [IT], et al) [DY] 3,11-13 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10; | [A]US875972 (WESSEL AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1,2,4,5,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5937741 (MANGER WILLIAM M [US]) [A] 1-5,8-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003192435 (MCNAIR JOHN DUNCAN [HK]) [A] 1-5,8-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4951558 (FIGLIUZZI VINCENT D [US]) [A] 1-5,8-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2004002280 |