EP1902752 - Cosmetic hair removing process using a depilatory composition in powder form [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2009 [2009/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chorfi, Radia 139 Avenue Camille Pelletan 13003 Marseille / FR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Roman, Michel Cabinet Roman 35, rue Paradis B.P. 30064 13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Roman, Michel CABINET ROMAN 35 rue Paradis, BP 2224 13207 Marseille Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06358016.1 | 19.09.2006 | [2008/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902752 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q9/04, A61K8/19, A61K8/25, A61K8/26, A61K8/46 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A61Q9/04 (EP);
A61K8/19 (EP);
A61K8/25 (EP);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/46 (EP);
A61K2800/87 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/49] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kosmetisches Enthaarungsverfahren, in dem ein pulverförmiges Enthaarungsmittel verwendet wird | [2008/13] | English: | Cosmetic hair removing process using a depilatory composition in powder form | [2008/13] | French: | Procédé cosmetique pour éliminer les poils du corps utilisant une composition épilatoire se presentant sous forme de poudre | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/17] | 19.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3338957 (GHAWAMI KEYHAN DIPL ING) [X] 1,6,7 * claims 1,2 * * page 3, line 9 - line 25 * * page 4, line 1 - line 20 *; | [X]FR1443545 (CHEMWAY CORP) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4177260 (WAJAROFF THEODOR [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10 * examples 5,6 *; | [A]CH499323 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-11 * column 3, line 27 - line 29 * * claims 4,5 *; | [A]EP1405629 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0054] * * example 9 * |