EP1750047 - Holder for laying pipes, cables, hoses and other circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maret, Alain 58 Rue du XXe Corps Amércain 57000 Metz / FR | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel Poupon L'Escurial - Technopole de Brabois 17 Avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-Les-Nancy Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/06] | Poupon, Michel Cabinet Michel POUPON, L'Escurial, Technopole de Brabois, 17, avenue de la Forêt de Haye 54519 Vandoeuvre-les-Nancy Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06366002.1 | 07.06.2006 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | FR20050008307 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0508307 | [2007/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1750047 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750047 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/10, F16L3/13, F16L3/22, F16L3/227 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
H02G3/30 (EP);
F16L3/13 (EP);
F16L3/223 (EP);
F16L3/227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Title | German: | Befestigungselement zum Verlegen von Rohren, Kabeln, Kanalisierungen und anderen Leitungen | [2007/06] | English: | Holder for laying pipes, cables, hoses and other circuits | [2007/06] | French: | Support de pose pour des tuyaux, câbles, canalisations et autre circuits | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/38] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2010 | CY | 25.08.2010 | CZ | 25.08.2010 | DK | 25.08.2010 | EE | 25.08.2010 | FI | 25.08.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | IE | 25.08.2010 | IT | 25.08.2010 | LT | 25.08.2010 | LV | 25.08.2010 | NL | 25.08.2010 | PL | 25.08.2010 | RO | 25.08.2010 | SE | 25.08.2010 | SI | 25.08.2010 | SK | 25.08.2010 | TR | 25.08.2010 | BG | 25.11.2010 | GR | 26.11.2010 | IS | 25.12.2010 | PT | 27.12.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
TR | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
IT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
RO | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
EE | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
SK | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
DK | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
CY | 25.08.2010 | ||
FI | 25.08.2010 | ||
LT | 25.08.2010 | ||
LV | 25.08.2010 | ||
NL | 25.08.2010 | ||
PL | 25.08.2010 | ||
SE | 25.08.2010 | ||
SI | 25.08.2010 | ||
BG | 25.11.2010 | ||
GR | 26.11.2010 | ||
IS | 25.12.2010 | ||
PT | 27.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 25.08.2010 | |
LT | 25.08.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1863821U (KLEIN WALTER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9 * page 6, paragraph 2 * * figure 5 *; | [X]FR1568793 (S.A. ÉLECTRIFICATION GÉNÉRALE INDUSTRIELLE LATOUR (E.G.I.L.)) [X] 1-3 * page 2, column 1, lines 31-35 * * page 2, column 1, lines 39-43 * * page 2, column 1, lines 55-59 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB1191102 (DOM HOLDINGS LTD) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * page 1, lines 82-88 * * page 2, lines 80-87 * * figures 1-12 *; | [XA]FR2251768 (EHB AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,9 * page 2, lines 18-35 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 5; | [X]US4534147 (CRISTELL FRANK A [US]) [X] 10,11,13 * column 4, lines 22-40 * * column 6, lines 4-12 ** figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]US5243800 (OLBRICH KURT [DE]) [X] 10,11,13 * column 2, lines 27-44 * * figures 4,5 *; | [X]FR2708053 (RAPID SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, lines 21-32 * * page 3, lines 17-26 * * figures 1,2 *; | [DX]FR2835035 (CACCIANI FABIEN [FR], et al) [DX] 1,8,10-13 * page 4, lines 8-17 * * figures 1,2,4 * | by applicant | BE571724 | FR2568730 | FR2835035 |