EP1745913 - Mold with detachable parts for plastic material pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Megatech Industries Intellectual Property, S.L. Poligono Industries Kalzadako S/N (Saratxo) 01466 Amurrio (Alava) / ES | [2014/13] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Möllertech Orense, S.L. Parque Empresaria Pol. Pereiro de Aguiar, Parc 21,22,23 32710 Pereiro de Aguiar (Orense) / ES | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Möllertech Orense, S.L. Parque Empresaria Pol. Pereiro de Aguiar, Parc 21,22,23 32710 Pereiro de Aguiar (Orense) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gonzalez Lopez, Alberto Poligono Industrial Kalzadako, s/n 01470 Amurrio (Alava) / ES | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2[deg] 08036 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Isern-Jara, Nuria J. Isern Patentes y Marcas Avda. Diagonal 463 Bis 2[deg] 08036 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2012/42] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/07] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Canadell-Isern, Roberto Travesera de Gracia, 30-1oC 08021 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 06380183.1 | 29.06.2006 | [2007/04] | Priority number, date | ES20050001711 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: ES 200501711 | [2007/04] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745913 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745913 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/08] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1745913 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/30, B29C45/26, B29C33/30 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
B29C45/14688 (EP,US);
B29C45/26 (ES);
B29C33/306 (EP);
B29C45/2602 (EP);
B29C45/2673 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/04] | B29C45/30, B29C45/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | Formwerkzeug mit abnehmbaren Teilen für Kunststoffgegenstände | [2007/04] | English: | Mold with detachable parts for plastic material pieces | [2007/04] | French: | Moule avec des parties détachables pour articles en matière plastique | [2007/04] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/37] | 23.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 24.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 24.12.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 24.12.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2006 | AT | 19.02.2014 | BE | 19.02.2014 | BG | 19.02.2014 | CY | 19.02.2014 | CZ | 19.02.2014 | DK | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | ES | 19.02.2014 | FI | 19.02.2014 | IT | 19.02.2014 | LT | 19.02.2014 | LV | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | NL | 19.02.2014 | PL | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SE | 19.02.2014 | SI | 19.02.2014 | SK | 19.02.2014 | TR | 19.02.2014 | GR | 20.05.2014 | IS | 19.06.2014 | PT | 19.06.2014 | GB | 29.06.2014 | IE | 29.06.2014 | LU | 29.06.2014 | CH | 30.06.2014 | LI | 30.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.06.2006 | |
AT | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
GB | 29.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
GB | 29.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
GB | 29.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
GB | 29.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
IE | 29.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
CH | 30.06.2014 | ||
LI | 30.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
IT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
LU | 29.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
PL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
BE | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
ES | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.02.2014 | |
IS | 19.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5567425 ; | [X]JPS63315210 ; | [A]JP01053817 |