EP1878568 - Roof liner and procedure for obtaining a roof liner for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Grupo Antolín Ingeniería, S.A. Carretera Madrid-Irún, Km. 244,8 09007 Burgos / ES | [2015/10] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states Grupo Antolín Ingeniería, S.A. Carretera Madrid-Irún, Km. 244,8 09007 Burgos / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anselmo Ariznavarreta, Esteban C/ El Parral, 66 09190 Villatoro (Burgos) / ES | 02 /
Morente Manero, Francisco Javier C/ Tinte, 1-4°D Burgos / ES | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93, 5 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder Paseo de la Castellana 93 28046 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2012/52] | Stiebe, Lars Magnus, et al Balder IP Law, S.L. Paseo de la Castellana 120 28046 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2008/03] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06380195.5 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/03] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878568 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878568 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/40, B32B27/36, B60R13/02 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/245 (US);
B32B19/06 (US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
B32B2255/02 (US);
B32B2262/0284 (US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2008/39] |
Former [2008/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dachauskleidung für Kraftfahrzeuge und Herstellungsverfahren | [2008/03] | English: | Roof liner and procedure for obtaining a roof liner for vehicles | [2008/03] | French: | Garniture de pavillon pour véhicule automobile et sa méthode de production | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 17.07.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4695501 (ROBINSON LEONARD W [US]) [A] 1-27 * column 4, line 27 - column 5, line 23 *; | [X]US4798756 (FUKUSHIMA SHIGEYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 29 *; | [DX]US4840832 (WEINLE PAUL L [US], et al) [DX] 1 * column 4, lines 7,8 *; | [X]US5007976 (SATTERFIELD MARSHALL G [US], et al) [X] 1-27 * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 25; figure 2 *; | [DX]US5258585 (JURIGA DUANE M [US]) [DX] 1,23,24 * figure 2 *; | [A]WO9602589 (ELDRA KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,24* abstract * | by applicant | US4840832 | US5007976 | US5258585 | US5536556 | EP0832787 | ES2157725 |