EP1892767 - Photovoltaic cell and production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BP Solar Espana, S.A. Unipersonal Poligono Industrial Zona Oeste s/n Tres Cantos 28760 Madrid / ES | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fernandez, Juan Manuel P.I. Tres Cantos Zona Oeste s/n 28760 Tres Cantos (Madid) / ES | 02 /
Bueno, Rafael C/Torrelaguna 72, Paracuellos de Jarama Madrid 28860 / ES | 03 /
Morilla, Carmen P.I. Tres Cantos Zona Oeste s/n 28760 Tres Cantos (Madid) / ES | 04 /
Vincueria, Ines P.I. Tres Cantos Zona Oeste s/n 28760 Tres Cantos (Madid) / ES | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Hamer, Christopher K. Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06380233.4 | 22.08.2006 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1892767 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/068 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/022433 (EP,US);
H01L31/02363 (EP,US);
H01L31/068 (EP,US);
H01L31/18 (EP,US);
Y02E10/547 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Photovoltaikzelle und deren Herstellung | [2008/09] | English: | Photovoltaic cell and production thereof | [2008/09] | French: | Cellule photovoltaïque et sa production | [2008/09] | Examination procedure | 28.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2452181 (LABO ELECTRONIQUE PHYSIQUE) [Y] 15 * page 1, line 28 - page 2, line 6 *; | [X]US4626613 (WENHAM STUART R [AU], et al) [X] 1,3,11,13,18,19 * column 2, lines 1-9 * * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 49; figures 1,2 * * column 5, line 18 - line 32 * * column 7, line 1 *; | [A]US6210991 (WENHAM STUART ROSS [AU], et al) [A] 1-3* column 5, line 23 - line 45; figure 5 *; | [XY]WO2005083799 (BP CORP NORTH AMERICA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-14,16-19 * page 5 - page 19; figure 1; claim - * [Y] 15 |