EP1923709 - Active linear current transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cirprotec, S.L. C/ Lepanto, 49 08223 Terrassa / ES | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pons Gonzalez, Carlos Lepanto, 49 08223 Terrassa / ES | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Hernández Hernández, Carlos Olten Patentes y Marcas Entença, 332-334 3º-2ª 08029 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Hernández Hernández, Carlos Olten Patentes y Marcas C/ Rocafort, 87 entlo. 4 08015 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2008/21] | Esteban Perez-Serrano, Maria Isabel UDAPI & ASOCIADOS Explanada, 8 28040 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06381049.3 | 16.11.2006 | [2008/21] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923709 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923709 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01R15/18 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
G01R15/181 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Aktive lineare Stromwandler | [2008/21] | English: | Active linear current transducer | [2008/21] | French: | Capteur de courant linéaire actif | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 05.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   18.03.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 06.07.2011 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of representative | [2011/42] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2006 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | IT | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | GB | 16.11.2012 | IE | 16.11.2012 | LU | 16.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 16.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.11.2012 | ||
LU | 16.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 16.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
GB | 16.11.2012 | ||
IE | 16.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
IE | 16.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
IT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9848287 (LEM LIAISONS ELECTRON MEC [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,8,10 * page 11, paragraph 2; figures 1,6A,6B * [Y] 3,9; | [YA]WO0072027 (ARBEITSGEMEINSCHAFT PROF HUGEL [CH], et al) [Y] 3 * page 14, paragraph 3 - page 15, paragraph 2; figures 1,3,10-13,17b * [A] 1,2,7; | [Y]WO0208771 (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [X]US2003137388 (MEIER HEINZ W [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,10 * paragraphs [0014] - [0017]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US2004178875 (SAITO MINORU [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraphs [0043] , [0078]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP1596206 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]) [A] 6* abstract * |