Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7499314 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2009 | B2 | US2008094884 | 24.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US216107 | 14.12.2007 | US28429905 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7321507 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2008 | B2 | US2007115717 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28429905 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4936862B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2012 | B2 | JP2007141440 | 07.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US28429905 | 21.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1788576 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2007 | A3 | EP1788576 | 23.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28429905 | 21.11.2005 |