EP1902982 - Stop module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wörner, Helmut Johann-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 3 73770 Denkendorf / DE | For all designated states Unterhuber, Sebastian Rilkeweg 4 73257 Köngen / DE | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Unterhuber, Sebastian Rilkeweg 4 73257 Köngen / DE | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Vogler, Bernd Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/13] | Vogler, Bernd Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Plochinger Strasse 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06400031.8 | 25.09.2006 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902982 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902982 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/88 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B65G47/8823 (EP,KR,US);
B23Q5/52 (KR);
B23Q16/001 (KR);
B23Q5/26 (KR);
F16F9/02 (KR);
B23Q2705/12 (KR);
B65G2205/06 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Anschlagmodul | [2008/13] | English: | Stop module | [2008/13] | French: | Module butée | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2008 | CZ | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IE | 19.11.2008 | IT | 19.11.2008 | LT | 19.11.2008 | LV | 19.11.2008 | NL | 19.11.2008 | PL | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | ES | 01.03.2009 | IS | 19.03.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
IT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
LT | 19.11.2008 | ||
LV | 19.11.2008 | ||
NL | 19.11.2008 | ||
PL | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
IS | 19.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 19.11.2008 | |
ES | 01.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 01.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3003674 (ENZINGER UNION WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, lines 16-32; figures 1,2,6,7 *; | [X]US5154277 (MURAKAMI ITSURO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,8 * column 4, lines 6-58; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19543797 (GROB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-10* column 4, line 32 - column 5, line 16; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6112877 (HERRICK IV HAROLD [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2003173187 (JOHNSON JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1-3,11-13 * paragraphs [0032] , [0034]; figures 2,3,9,10 *; | [A]FR2856998 (ROBOTIQUES 3 DIMENSIONS [FR]) [A] 1,5-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1522383 (GROB WERKE BURKHART GROB EK [DE]) [A] 1,5-13 * the whole document * |