EP1717107 - Bumper provided with supports [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Constellium Switzerland AG Max-Högger-Strasse 6 8048 Zürich / CH | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/24] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Constellium Switzerland AG Max-Högger-Strasse 6 8048 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Engineered Products Switzerland AG (Ltd.) Max-Högger-Strasse 6 8048 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2010/23] | For all designated states 3A Technology & Management AG Badischer Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | ||
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Alcan Technology & Management Ltd. Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Simon Alter Postweg 4 78250 Tengen / DE | 02 /
Rebstock, Thomas Beim Schlossgarten 1 78247 Hilzingen / DE | 03 /
Artner, Bernd Merowinger Weg 1 71272 Renningen / DE | 04 /
Maier, Patrick In den Wehrgärten 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [2014/52] |
Former [2006/44] | 01 /
Frank, Simon Alter Postweg 4 78250 Tengen / DE | ||
02 /
Rebstock, Thomas Beim Schlossgarten 1 78247 Hilzingen / DE | Representative(s) | Wagner, Kilian, et al Behrmann Wagner Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [2014/39] |
Former [2010/12] | Wagner, Kilian, et al Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Hiebsch, Gerhard F., et al Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464 78204 Singen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06405158.4 | 12.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | DE20052006731U | 27.04.2005 Original published format: DE 202005006731 U | DE20052008321U | 24.05.2005 Original published format: DE 202005008321 U | [2006/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1717107 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1717107 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/24 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B60R19/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Stossstange mit Halterungen | [2006/44] | English: | Bumper provided with supports | [2006/44] | French: | Pare-chocs pourvu de supports de fixation | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 22.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.04.2006 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | IT | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | AT | 12.04.2015 | IE | 12.04.2015 | LU | 12.04.2015 | BE | 30.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/36] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
AT | 12.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
IE | 12.04.2015 | ||
LU | 12.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
LU | 12.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
IT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004232711 (FRANK SIMON [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0023] - [0028]; figures 1-4 * * abstract * [Y] 5-32; | [XY]JPS61143241 ; | [A]DE10226527 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US6371541 (PEDERSEN ROALD HELLAND [NO]) [A] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US2003218343 (SATO MANABU [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US5727827 (SHIBUYA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US4974891 (FURUTA KATSUMI [JP]) [A] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]GB261213 (JOSEPH EDGE BECKETT, et al) [A] 1-32 * page 5, line 91 - page 6, line 112; figures 1-3 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861119), vol. 010, no. 342, Database accession no. (M - 536), & JP61143241 A 19860630 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * [Y] 5-32 |