EP1870785 - Timepiece fitted with a mechanism showing the phases of the moon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daniel Roth et Gérald Genta Haute Horlogerie SA 42, chemin du Grand-Puits, Case Postale 382 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | [2009/33] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Daniel Roth et Gerald Genta Haute Horlogerie SA 42, chemin du Grand-Puits, Case Postale 382 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reymond, Jeanne Rue G-H. Piguet 19B 1347 Le Sentier / CH | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A. 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | Savoye, Jean-Paul, et al Moinas & Savoye S.A., 42, rue Plantamour 1201 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 06405266.5 | 22.06.2006 | [2007/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1870785 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1870785 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G04B19/26 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
G04B19/268 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2008/36] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mit einem Mechanismus zur Anzeige von Mondphasen ausgerüstete Uhr | [2007/52] | English: | Timepiece fitted with a mechanism showing the phases of the moon | [2007/52] | French: | Pièce d'horlogerie munie d'un mécanisme d'affichage des phases de lune | [2009/02] |
Former [2007/52] | Piece d'horlogerie munie d'un mecanisme d'affichage des phases de lune | Examination procedure | 02.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 27.06.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP1321832 (PIGUET FREDERIC SA [CH]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2863368 (ZENITH INTERNAT [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract * |