Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8398403 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2013 | B2 | US2008124682 | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5405013B | Global Dossier | 05.02.2014 | B2 | JP2008132334 | 12.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1925269 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2009 | B1 | EP1925269 | 28.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE448750T | 15.12.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0704210 | 22.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602006010577D1 | 31.12.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2332736T | 11.02.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP06405494 | 27.11.2006 |