EP1925269 - Tooth root canal anchorage assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordin, Harald Villa Amphion Chemin du Chabloz 8 CH-1822 Chernex / CH | For all designated states Nordin, Peter Villa Amphion Chemin du Chabloz 8 1822 Chernex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Nordin, Harald E. Villa Amphion, Chemin du Chabloz 8 CH-1822 Chernex / CH | ||
For all designated states Nordin, Peter Villa Amphion Chemin du Chabloz 8 1822 Chernex / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 06405494.3 | 27.11.2006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925269 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925269 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/30, A61C3/02, A61C5/02 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
A61C13/30 (EP,US);
A61C3/02 (EP,US);
A61C5/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Title | German: | Zahnwurzelkanalverankerungsanordnung | [2008/22] | English: | Tooth root canal anchorage assembly | [2008/22] | French: | Ensemble d'ancrage de canal de racine dentaire | [2008/22] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 21.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | DK | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | FI | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | PL | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | IE | 27.11.2009 | LU | 27.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.11.2009 | ||
LU | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.11.2009 | ||
LU | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
DK | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
FI | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
PL | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0037864 (SCOTT EDWARD S) [A] 1,2,8 * page 7, line 10 - page 8, line 9 * * figures 3,5,6 *; | [X]EP0083028 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,5 * page 7, lines 25-30 * * page 11, lines 1-22 * * figures 5,6 *; | [X]CH652910 (HERBERT SPANG DR MED DENT) [X] 1,5 * page 2, column R, line 59 - page 3, column R, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9216157 (HANSSON LARS [SE]) [A] 1,2,7 * page 3, lines 5-23 * * page 4, columns 21-25 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2716795 (MILLET LAURENT [FR]) [A] 8 * page 5, lines 8-28 ** figures 6,7 *; | [XY]WO9625119 (REYNAUD MARC [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * page 6, line 6 - page 7, line 25 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 21 * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 16 * * figures 1-8 * [Y] 3,8; | [A]WO9629017 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,5 * page 7, lines 17-30 * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 10 * * page 14, lines 1-12 * * figures 1,3,6a,6b *; | [Y]EP0780100 (MAILLEFER INSTR SA [CH]) [Y] 8 * column 2, lines 33-43 * * column 4, lines 1-14 * * figures 1-3 *; | [YA]US2004265783 (KARMAKER AJIT [US], et al) [Y] 3 * page 3, paragraph 40 * * page 4, paragraphs 48,49 * * page 5, paragraph 52 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1,4 | by applicant | EP0113792 | EP0245878 | US6402519 |