EP1724408 - Distance profile for false ceilings made of plasterboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lomurno, Pietro 6, Rue Parma 70022 Altamura / IT | [2006/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/47] | Application number, filing date | 06425004.6 | 04.01.2006 | [2006/47] | Priority number, date | IT2005BA00021 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: IT BA20050021 | [2006/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724408 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724408 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/30, E04F19/04, E04F13/06 | [2006/47] | CPC: |
E04B9/30 (EP,US);
E04F19/02 (EP,US);
E04F19/0436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] |
Former [2007/30] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 09.11.2007 | BA | 09.11.2007 | HR | 09.11.2007 | MK | 09.11.2007 | YU | 09.11.2007 | Title | German: | Abstandshalterprofil für Zwischendecken aus Gipskartonplatten | [2006/47] | English: | Distance profile for false ceilings made of plasterboard | [2006/47] | French: | Entretoise murale pour faux plafonds en placoplâtre | [2006/47] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.09.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 01.10.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.07.2007 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | IS   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | LT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | LV   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | 04.07.2007 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 04.07.2007 | M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2007 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.04.2008 | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2006 | AT | 30.10.2013 | BG | 30.10.2013 | CY | 30.10.2013 | CZ | 30.10.2013 | DK | 30.10.2013 | EE | 30.10.2013 | ES | 30.10.2013 | FI | 30.10.2013 | IT | 30.10.2013 | LT | 30.10.2013 | LV | 30.10.2013 | MC | 30.10.2013 | NL | 30.10.2013 | PL | 30.10.2013 | RO | 30.10.2013 | SE | 30.10.2013 | SI | 30.10.2013 | SK | 30.10.2013 | TR | 30.10.2013 | IE | 04.01.2014 | LU | 04.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | GR | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | IS | 28.02.2014 | PT | 28.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.01.2006 | |
AT | 30.10.2013 | ||
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.01.2014 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.01.2014 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
GR | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
BG | 30.10.2013 | ||
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.01.2014 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SI | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.01.2014 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.01.2014 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IE | 04.01.2014 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
DK | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.01.2014 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
IT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
MC | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
PL | 30.10.2013 | ||
RO | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
SK | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
EE | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
PT | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
CY | 30.10.2013 | ||
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
LV | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 30.10.2013 | |
ES | 30.10.2013 | ||
FI | 30.10.2013 | ||
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
IS | 28.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 30.10.2013 | |
LT | 30.10.2013 | ||
NL | 30.10.2013 | ||
SE | 30.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 30.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9104360U (PROMAT GMBH, 4030 RATINGEN, DE) [A] 1-10* page 5, line 6 - page 6, line 17; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0872606 (HCE HANDELSONDERNEMING V O F [NL]) [A] 1-10 * column 4, line 18 - line 29; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29821319U (BENIRSCHKE RUDOLF [DE], et al) [A] * page 2 - page 3; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0872606 | DE29821319U |