EP1813803 - Fuel pump operated by means of a shape memory material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | Change - representative | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETI MARELLI POWERTRAIN S.p.A. Viale Aldo Borletti, 61/63 20011 Corbetta (MI) / IT | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellato, Nazario Via L. Berti, 9 40131 Bologna / IT | 02 /
Colli, Marcello Via della Pace, 6 42100 Reggio Emilia / IT | 03 /
Pancotti, Cesare Via Lidice, 12 40139 Bologna / IT | 04 /
Toschi, Lanfranco Via A. Saffi, 1 40033 Casalecchio di Reno / IT | 05 /
Dragoni, Eugenio Via Guido Reni, 18 48022 Lugo / IT | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2007/31] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425042.6 | 30.01.2006 | [2007/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813803 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F02M59/14, F02M37/04, F04B43/00 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
F02M37/046 (EP);
F04B43/0054 (EP);
F05C2251/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/15] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffpumpe betätigt mittels eines Materials mit Formgedächtnis | [2007/31] | English: | Fuel pump operated by means of a shape memory material | [2007/31] | French: | Pompe à carburant entraîné par un matériau à mémoire de forme | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/35] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP1460260 (SOFABEX [FR]) [DY] 1-14 * column 4, paragraph 21; figure 2 *; | [Y]US4846119 (GEYER WERNER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *; | [Y]US3606592 (MADURSKI JOSEPH P, et al) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, lines 9-43; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPS6198980 ; | [A]JP2001073906 ; | [A]JP2001336443 ; | [A]JPH01170776 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860919), vol. 010, no. 277, Database accession no. (M - 519), & JP61098980 A 19860517 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001073906 A 20010321 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020804), vol. 2002, no. 04, & JP2001336443 A 20011207 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891006), vol. 013, no. 446, Database accession no. (M - 877), & JP01170776 A 19890705 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-14 * abstract * |