EP1818196 - Device for treating an air flow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denso Thermal Systems Spa Frazione Masio, 24 10046 Poirino, (TO) / IT | [2009/13] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states DENSO THERMAL SYSTEMS S.p.A. Frazione Masio 24 10046 Poirino (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gataleta, Raffaele c/o Denso Thermal System Spa Frazione Masio 24 10046 Poirino (Torino) / IT | [2008/47] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
Gataleta, Raffaele Denso Thermal System Spa Frazione Masio 24 10046 Poirino (Torino) / IT | Representative(s) | Marchitelli, Mauro Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/33] | Marchitelli, Mauro c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425080.6 | 13.02.2006 | [2007/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818196 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1818196 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B60H1/00664 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/33] | Title | German: | Luftstromsteuereinheit | [2007/33] | English: | Device for treating an air flow | [2007/33] | French: | Dispositif de distribution d'air. | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 21.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | LT | 25.03.2009 | LV | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | IS | 25.07.2009 | PT | 01.09.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CY | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CY | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
PT | 01.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1070611 (BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0048] - [0055]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]DE10261037 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-5* paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0053]; figure 4 *; | [A]DE10322457 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figures 1a,1b * |